EP0502836 - Radiator for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Engine Cooling Aktiebolag Box 2064 294 02 Sölvesborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states Valeo Engine Cooling Aktiebolag Box 2064 S-294 02 Sölvesborg / SE | ||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states BLACKSTONE SWEDEN AB Mjällby S-294 02 Sölvesborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersson, Lars Elvsbergsvägen 15 S-374 41 Karlshamn / SE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Säfwenberg, Björn, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Säfwenberg, Björn, et al Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10316 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92850049.5 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | SE19910000674 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: SE 9100674 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502836 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502836 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502836 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/00 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
F28F9/001 (EP);
F28F2275/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/37] | Title | German: | Radiator für Brennkraftmaschine mit innerer Verbrennung | [1992/37] | English: | Radiator for an internal combustion engine | [1992/37] | French: | Radiateur pour moteur à combustion interne | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0170952 ; | [A]US1784766 |