EP0512974 - Device for aligning and clamping a rail flange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEACO N.V. de Ruyterkade 58A Curacao / AN | [1995/48] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states GANTREX LIMITED 12 Barr Road Ajax Ontario L1S 3X9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenhow, David 1 Sandringham Avenue Hamilton, Ontario L9C 2H3 / CA | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Vanderperre, Robert, et al Gevers Livornostraat 7 1060 Brussel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Vanderperre, Robert, et al Bureau Vander Haeghen S.A. Rue Colonel Bourg 108 A B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 92870070.7 | 07.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19910696946 | 08.05.1991 Original published format: US 696946 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512974 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512974 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/66 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
E01B9/38 (KR);
E01B9/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/04] |
Former [1992/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten und Befestigen von einem Schienenflansch | [1992/46] | English: | Device for aligning and clamping a rail flange | [1992/46] | French: | Dispositif pour aligner et fixer une bride de rail | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.06.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.06.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.06.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0223897 (MINNER HANS K); | [Y]EP0258049 (GH INT LTD [KY]); | [Y]GB2191805 (BAYLISS CHARLES ALBERT); | [Y]GB553885 (PHILPLUG PRODUCTS LTD, et al) |