EP0534928 - Arrangement for locking bicycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN Verwaltungs- und Verwertungs-Gesellschaft m.b.H. Peter-Tunner-Strasse 15 8700 Leoben / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states PATENTE-MARKEN-LIZENZEN Verwaltungs- und Verwertungs-Gesellschaft mbH Peter-Tunner-Strasse 15 A-8700 Leoben / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramaseder, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. Robert-Stolzstrasse 14 A-4020 Linz / AT | [1993/13] | Application number, filing date | 92890197.4 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | AT19910001909 | 23.09.1991 Original published format: AT 190991 | AT19920001508 | 23.07.1992 Original published format: AT 150892 | AT19920001507 | 23.07.1992 Original published format: AT 150792 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534928 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62H3/10 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
B62H3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, LU, NL [1993/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Sicherung von Fahrrädern | [1993/13] | English: | Arrangement for locking bicycles | [1993/13] | French: | Dispositif pour bloquer des bicyclettes | [1993/13] | File destroyed: | 24.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/22] | 04.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2803349 ; | [YP]FR2664545 ; | [YP]GB2245238 ; | [A]GB445214 ; | [A]DE9013242U ; | [A]FR2402574 |