EP0549559 - Superstructure with concrete sleepers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLGEMEINE BAUGESELLSCHAFT - A. PORR AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Rennweg 12 1031 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states ALLGEMEINE BAUGESELLSCHAFT - A. PORR AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Rennweg 12 A-1031 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salzmann, Heinrich Mirabellplatz 7 A-5020 Salzburg / AT | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Widtmann, Georg Clusiusgasse 2/8 1090 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Widtmann, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. techn. Clusiusgasse 2/8 A-1090 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 92890256.8 | 04.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | AT19910002542 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: AT 254291 | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549559 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549559 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01B1/00, E01B19/00 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
E01B1/008 (EP);
E01B19/00 (EP);
E01B1/001 (EP);
E01B1/002 (EP);
E01B2204/01 (EP);
E01B2204/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1993/26] | Title | German: | Oberbau mit Betonschwellen | [1993/26] | English: | Superstructure with concrete sleepers | [1993/26] | French: | Superstructure équipée de traverses en béton | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0008743 ; | [Y]AT356162B ; | [A]DE2821111 ; | [A]EP0167844 ; | [A]DE3809466 ; | [A]EP0028084 ; | [A]WO9116195 ; | [A]DE4013357 |