EP0560858 - NOZZLE ASSEMBLY FOR PREVENTING BACK-FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1997 [1997/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMW (TECHNOLOGY) LIMITED 4 Wilford Bridge Spur, Melton, Woodbridge Suffolk IP12 1RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states DMW (TECHNOLOGY) LIMITED 4 Wilford Bridge Spur, Melton, Woodbridge Suffolk IP12 1RJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNNE, Stephen Terence Shotley Hall, Church Walk, Shotley Ipswich, Suffolk IP9 1EX / GB | 02 /
WESTON, Terence Edward Thornlea, Pixey Green , Stradbroke Suffolk IP21 5NG / GB | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1993/49] |
Former [1993/38] | Dummett, Thomas Ian Peter Dummett Copp & Co. 25 The Square Martlesham Heath, Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92900624.5 | 04.12.1991 | [1993/38] | WO1991GB02147 | Priority number, date | GB19900026298 | 04.12.1990 Original published format: GB 9026298 | GB19910009072 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: GB 9109072 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210306 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560858 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560858 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B05B1/00 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
B05B11/0005 (EP,US);
B05B1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/38] | B05B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/38] | Title | German: | DÜSENVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERHINDERN DES RÜCKFLUSSES | [1996/07] | English: | NOZZLE ASSEMBLY FOR PREVENTING BACK-FLOW | [1993/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE BUSE PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER LE REFLUEMENT | [1993/38] |
Former [1993/38] | DÜSEVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERHINDERN DES RÜCKFLÜSSES | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 01.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2524348 (RAMIS MICHEL [FR]); | [X]EP0379818 (POIZOT FRANCIS) | Examination | EP0387473 |