EP0513311 - Fastening means for a greenhouse comprising a profiled frame for guiding a foil and a snap-on frame for the affixing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/47] | A GREENHOUSE PROVIDED WITH A PROFILED FRAME FOR GUIDING A FOIL AND ALSO PROVIDED WITH A SNAP-ON FRAME FOR THE AFFIXING THEREOF, AS WELL AS A PROFILED FRAME, A PROFILED SNAP-ON FRAME, A CLAMPING CONSTRUCTION AND A PROFILED BEAM | ||
[1995/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROLLOOS SORENSEN B.V. Krabbescheer 6, Postbus 162 NL-4940 AD Raamsdonksveer / NL | [1992/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Arnoldus Henricus Antonius Vliethof 51 NL-4844 EZ Terheijden / NL | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1992/47] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 92900817.5 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991NL00262 | Priority number, date | NL19900002687 | 06.12.1990 Original published format: NL 9002687 | [1992/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210086 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513311 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513311 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/14 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
A01G9/1407 (EP,US);
Y02A40/25 (EP,US);
Y10S403/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1992/47] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für ein Gewächshaus bestehend aus einem Profilrahmen zum leiten einer Folie und einem Schnapprahmen zu dessen Befestigung | [1995/38] | English: | Fastening means for a greenhouse comprising a profiled frame for guiding a foil and a snap-on frame for the affixing thereof | [1995/38] | French: | Ensemble de fixation pour une serre comprenant un cadre profilé guidant une feuille et un cadre à emboitement assujettissant celle-ci | [1995/38] |
Former [1992/47] | GEWÄCHSHAUS MIT PROFILRAHMEN ZUM LEITEN EINER FOLIE SOWIE MIT SCHNAPPRAHMEN ZU DESSEN BEFESTIGUNG, UND EBENSO PROFILRAHMEN, SCHNAPPRAHMEN, KLEMMVORRICHTUNG UND PROFILTRÄGER | ||
Former [1992/47] | A GREENHOUSE PROVIDED WITH A PROFILED FRAME FOR GUIDING A FOIL AND ALSO PROVIDED WITH A SNAP-ON FRAME FOR THE AFFIXING THEREOF, AS WELL AS A PROFILED FRAME, A PROFILED SNAP-ON FRAME, A CLAMPING CONSTRUCTION AND A PROFILED BEAM | ||
Former [1992/47] | SERRE MUNIE D'UN CADRE PROFILE GUIDANT UNE FEUILLE ET D'UN CADRE A EMBOITEMENT ASSUJETTISSANT CELLE-CI, CADRE PROFILE, CADRE PROFILE A EMBOITEMENT, ENSEMBLE DE SERRAGE ET POUTRE PROFILEE | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1992 | Translation filed | 03.08.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8803231 (NOLAN V E L [AU]); | [Y]FR2511221 (DALLE YVES [FR]); | [A]US3803671 (STUPPY F, et al) |