EP0558627 - TOP WITH PRECESSION TRACING POINT FOR TRACING UNIQUE SPIRALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOODLETOP Lincoln South Building, Suite 106, Lincoln & 8th Carmel, CA 93921 / US | [1993/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McKAY, Christopher, B. P.O Box 5632 Carmel, CA 93921 / US | 02 /
DeZORDO, Stephen P.O. Box 5632 Carmel, CA 93921 / US | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Lichtenberg, Erik, et al Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Lichtenberg, Erik, et al Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 92901014.8 | 12.11.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991US08434 | Priority number, date | US19900615682 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: US 615682 | US19910770513 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: US 770513 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9209349 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558627 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558627 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A63H1/16 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
A63H1/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/36] | A63H1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/36] | Title | German: | KREISEL MIT PRÄZESSIONSFÜHRUNGSSPITZE ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINZIGARTIGER SPIRALEN | [1993/36] | English: | TOP WITH PRECESSION TRACING POINT FOR TRACING UNIQUE SPIRALS | [1993/36] | French: | TOUPIE POURVUE D'UNE POINTE TRACANTE A PRECESSION ET PERMETTANT DE TRACER DES SPIRALES UNIQUES | [1995/26] |
Former [1993/36] | TOUPIE POURVUE D'UNE POINTE TRA ANTE A PRECESSION ET PERMETTANT DE TRACER DES SPIRALES UNIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 14.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.1996
27.03.1996
ADMISSIBLE KIDS PROMOTION GMBH Ledergasse 6 85567 Grafing / DE Opponent's representative Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.1996
27.03.1996
ADMISSIBLE KIDS PROMOTION GMBH Ledergasse 6 85567 Grafing / DE Opponent's representative Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1996/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.1996
27.03.1996
ADMISSIBLE KIDS PROMOTION GMBH Ledergasse 6 85567 Grafing / DE Opponent's representative Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | 08.05.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.05.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 28.06.1995 | |
LI | 28.06.1995 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US93760 ; | [Y]US541802 ; | [X]US2618891 (PEPIN LAWRENCE H); | [Y]US3083498 (KELLEY RICHARD A); | [Y]US3510949 (CHRISTY ALEXANDER C); | [X]GB1250360 ; | [Y]US3861077 (LINDQUIST ROBERT) |