EP0513313 - METHOD FOR RESETTING THE LOCAL OSCILLATORS OF A RECEIVER AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOUCHE, Yvon Thomson-CSF SCPI F-92045 Paris-La Défense Cédex 67 / FR | 02 /
RAULT, Jean-Bernard Thomson-CSF SCPI F-92045 Paris-La Défense Cédex 67 / FR | 03 /
DE COUASNON, Tristan Thomson-CSF SCPI F-92045 Paris-La Défense Cédex 67 / FR | 04 /
MONNIER, Raoul Thomson-CSF SCPI F-92045 Paris-La Défense Cédex 67 / FR | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/14] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1992/47] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 92901024.7 | 29.11.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991FR00951 | Priority number, date | FR19900015015 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9015015 | [1992/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210043 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513313 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513313 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/06 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
H04L27/2657 (EP,US);
H04L27/2679 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NEUSYNCHRONISIERUNG DER LOKALEN OSZILLATOREN EINES EMPFÄNGERS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1992/47] | English: | METHOD FOR RESETTING THE LOCAL OSCILLATORS OF A RECEIVER AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD | [1992/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECALAGE DES OSCILLATEURS LOCAUX D'UN RECEPTEUR ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DU PROCEDE | [1992/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.02.1997 | DK | 12.02.1997 | NL | 12.02.1997 | SE | 12.05.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 12.02.1997 | |
DK | 12.02.1997 | ||
SE | 12.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 12.02.1997 | |
SE | 12.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 12.02.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2145906 (NEC CORP); | [A]EP0365431 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - IEEE GLOBAL TELCOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE vol. 3, Novembre 1984, ATLANTA pages 1553 - 1557; BOTARO HIROSAKI ET AL.: 'A HIGHLY EFFICIENT HF MODEM WITH ADAPTIVE CONTROL ALGORITHM' | Examination | WO9004893 |