EP0531464 - STORAGE SALT MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hörmansdörfer, Gerd Kastanieneck 6 A D-31303 Burgdorf / DE | [1995/42] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states HÖRMANNSDÖRFER, Gerd Kastanieneck 6 A D-31303 Burgdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Eikenberg, Kurt-Rudolf, et al Patentanwalt Schackstrasse 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Eikenberg, Kurt-Rudolf, et al Patentanwalt Schackstrasse 1 D-30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 92901752.3 | 31.12.1991 | [1993/11] | WO1991DE01014 | Priority number, date | DE19904042268 | 31.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4042268 | [1993/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212217 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531464 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531464 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C09K5/063 (EP);
C09K5/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | SPEICHERSALZ-MISCHUNGEN | [1993/11] | English: | STORAGE SALT MIXTURES | [1993/11] | French: | MELANGES DE SELS POUR LE STOCKAGE | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 | 04.11.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.11.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.1996 | FR | 28.02.1996 | GB | 28.02.1996 | IT | 28.02.1996 | SE | 31.05.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 28.02.1996 | |
FR | 28.02.1996 | ||
GB | 28.02.1996 | ||
IT | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 28.02.1996 | |
GB | 28.02.1996 | ||
IT | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 28.02.1996 | |
IT | 28.02.1996 | ||
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 28.02.1996 | |
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/06] | SE | 31.05.1996 | |
FR | 26.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 31.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4189393 (GAWRON KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]GB1596883 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH); | [A]US4057101 (RUKA ROSWELL J, et al) |