EP0563217 - HYDROGEN PEROXIDE DESTROYING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92623-9534 / US | ||
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive, P.O. Box 10534 Irvine, California 92713-9534 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, John Y. 13122 Shasta Way Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 02 /
COOK, James N. 28472 Botorrita Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92902165.7 | 17.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991US09327 | Priority number, date | US19900631621 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 631621 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211041 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563217 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563217 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, A01N59/00, G02C13/00 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
C11D17/0073 (EP,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A61L12/124 (EP,US);
A61L12/126 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/0078 (EP,US);
C11D3/38654 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N25/32 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ZERSETZUNG VON WASSERSTOFFPEROXID UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1993/40] | English: | HYDROGEN PEROXIDE DESTROYING COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING SAME | [1993/40] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETRUISANT LE PEROXYDE D'HYDROGENE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CES COMPOSITIONS | [1993/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Request for further processing for: | 21.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 17.12.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/07] | LU | 31.12.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0139994 (BARNES HIND INC [US]); | [X]EP0209071 (TITMUS EUROCON KONTAKTLINSEN [DE]); | [A]EP0219220 (ALLERGAN PHARMA [US]); | [Y]WO9011786 (PHARMACIA AB [SE]); | [YP]EP0426489 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [XP]WO9112825 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [XP]WO9112826 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) |