EP0586377 - MECHANISM FOR MOVEMENTS OF PREFIXED PATH, REFERABLE AS OF ELLIPTICAL SHAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRIPPA, Ugo Via Brioschi, 16 I-22060 Sirtori / IT | [1994/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92902260.6 | 17.12.1991 | [1994/11] | WO1991IT00111 | Priority number, date | IT1991MI01392 | 21.05.1991 Original published format: IT MI911392 | [1994/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9220495 | Date: | 26.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586377 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0586377 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/04, B25J9/10 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
B25J9/106 (EP,US);
B25J9/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/11] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSMECHANISMUS MIT VORBESTIMMTER BAHN, UNTER ANDEREM ELLIPSFÖRMIG | [1994/11] | English: | MECHANISM FOR MOVEMENTS OF PREFIXED PATH, REFERABLE AS OF ELLIPTICAL SHAPE | [1994/11] | French: | MECANISME PERMETTANT DES MOUVEMENTS SELON UNE TRAJECTOIRE DETERMINEE, DITE DE FORME ELLIPTIQUE | [1994/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3561614 (TEZUKA YOSHITOMO, et al); | [Y]US3587872 (PAULY PAUL E); | [X]DE2802738 (FELSS GEB); | [X]GB2022046 (SHIROYAMA KOGYO KK); | [A]EP0008981 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]EP0065859 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0076947 (RHEIN RUHR GUMMI GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4636138 (GORMAN ROBERT H [US]); | [X]FR2593106 (ROYER JACQUES [FR]); | [A]EP0291292 (SHINKO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9104138 (GENMARK AUTOMATION [US]) |