EP0575344 - MICROLI FLYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE DE CONSTRUCTION AERONAUTIQUE SOFCA 512, alleé Voltaire, ZAC des Radars F-91350 Grigny / FR | [1993/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALALUQUETAS, Jacques 23, allée du Mali F-94260 Fresnes / FR | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Hasenrader, Hubert Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92903203.5 | 20.12.1991 | [1993/52] | WO1991FR01042 | Priority number, date | FR19910000337 | 14.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100337 | [1993/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212050 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575344 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575344 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B64C31/02 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
B64C31/036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | FLIEGENDES FAHRZEUG, WIE MOTORISIERTES ULTRALEICHTES FLUGZEUG | [1993/52] | English: | MICROLI FLYING DEVICE | [1993/52] | French: | ENGIN VOLANT DU TYPE ULTRA-LEGER MOTORISE | [1993/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | 23.09.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.09.1993 | M01   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.1994 | DK | 31.08.1994 | GR | 31.08.1994 | IT | 31.08.1994 | NL | 31.08.1994 | SE | 30.11.1994 | DE | 01.12.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
GR | 31.08.1994 | ||
IT | 31.08.1994 | ||
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
IT | 31.08.1994 | ||
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
DK | 31.08.1994 | ||
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
NL | 31.08.1994 | ||
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 31.08.1994 | |
DE | 01.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 31.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1182962 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH); | [Y]US3443779 (ROGALLO FRANCIS M, et al); | [A]US4204656 (SEWARD DEWITT C [US]); | [Y]EP0130925 (SNYDER STEPHEN LOUIS) |