EP0566644 - Method of removing endotoxins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/43] | A METHOD OF INHIBITING ENDOTOXIN INDUCED EFFECTS | ||
[1997/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Aktiebolag 112 87 Stockholm / SE | [1997/15] |
Former [1995/02] | For all designated states Pharmacia AB (reg.number 556131-9608) S-171 97 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1993/43] | For all designated states KABI PHARMACIA AB S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMFORS, Christer Brobyvägen 54 S-182 75 Täby / SE | 02 /
LAMPEN, Ellinor Hidingebacke 9 S-163 65 Spänga / SE | 03 /
LINDGREN, Svante Lättsta, Skeppstuna S-195 00 Märsta / SE | 04 /
SANDBERG, Göran Björkskog S-762 00 Rimbo / SE | 05 /
WAHLEN, Raymond Pepparbodavägen 37 S-194 53 Upplands Väsby / SE | 06 /
WESTBERG, Björn Lötsjövägen 73 S-172 65 Spänga / SE | [1997/37] |
Former [1993/43] | 01 /
GRIMFORS, Christer Brobyvägen 54 S-182 75 Täby / SE | ||
02 /
LAMPEN, Ellinor Hidingebacke 9 S-163 65 Sp nga / SE | |||
03 /
LINDGREN, Svante Lättsta, Skeppstuna S-195 00 Märsta / SE | |||
04 /
SANDBERG, Göran Björkskog S-762 00 Rimbo / SE | |||
05 /
WAHLEN, Raymond Pepparbodavägen 37 S-194 53 Upplands Väsby / SE | |||
06 /
WESTBERG, Björn Lötsjövägen 73 S-172 65 Spänga / SE | Application number, filing date | 92903332.2 | 20.12.1991 | [1993/43] | WO1991SE00893 | Priority number, date | SE19910000059 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: SE 9100059 | [1993/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211847 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566644 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566644 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K31/195, A61K31/16, // C07C279/14, C07C279/12, C07C229/26, C07C237/06 | [1993/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP);
A61K31/155 (EP);
A61K31/195 (EP);
A61L2/0088 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Endotoxinen | [1997/37] | English: | Method of removing endotoxins | [1997/37] | French: | Méthode pour séparer les endotoxines | [1997/37] |
Former [1993/43] | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG VON ENDOTOXIN INDUZIERTEN EFFEKTEN | ||
Former [1993/43] | A METHOD OF INHIBITING ENDOTOXIN INDUCED EFFECTS | ||
Former [1993/43] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'INHIBER LES EFFETS INDUITS PAR L'ENDOTOXINE | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/37: (deleted) | EPB 1997/37: (deleted) | EPB 1997/37: (deleted) | EPB 1996/23: Teilanmeldung 96104316.3 eingereicht am 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Divisional application 96104316.3 filed on 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Demande divisionnaire 96104316.3 déposée le 19/03/96 | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 16.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/02] | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/03] | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/03] | 08.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96104316.3 / EP0719550 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1253830 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4282217 (BAGLIONI ALESSANDRO, et al); | [A]US4308280 (SPORTOLETTI GIANCARLO, et al); | [A]US4405643 (SPORTOLETTI GIANCARLO [IT], et al); | [A]EP0333474 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]EP0342139 (CORTIAL [FR]); | [PX]GB2240041 (SCRAS [FR]) | [A] - STN International, File Medline, STN accession No. 84040139, GL KOVACS et al: "Hormonally active argine-vasopressin suppresses endotoxin-induced fever in rats: lack of effect of oxytocin and a behaviorally active vasopressin fragment", Neuroendocrinology, (1983 Oct) 37 (4) 258-61. | [A] - STN International, File Medline, STN accession No. 88290981, JV REYNOLDS et al. "Immunomodulatory mechanisms of arginine", Surgery, (1988 Aug) 104 (2) 142-51. | [A] - STN International, File Biosis, STN accession No. 91:55734, Biosis accession No. 91:34015, R G KILBOURN et al: "Reversal of endotoxin-mediated shock by N-G methyl-L-arginine an inhibitor of nitric oxide synthesis", Biochem Biophys Res Commun 172 (3), 1990, 1132-1138. |