EP0564572 - IMPROVED HOLLOW JET PROPULSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAS, Jean-Bernard Villa des Haules Allée J.B. Cochin 76790 Etretat / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states CHAS, Jean-Bernard Villa des Haules Allée J.B. Cochin F-76790 Etretat / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92903500.4 | 02.01.1992 | [1993/41] | WO1992FR00001 | Priority number, date | FR19910000022 | 02.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100022 | [1993/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212048 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564572 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564572 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B63H11/08 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
B63H11/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, MC, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG AN EINER HOHLSTRAHLANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [1993/41] | English: | IMPROVED HOLLOW JET PROPULSION DEVICE | [1993/41] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENT A UN DISPOSITIF PROPULSEUR A JET CREUX | [1993/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1323871 (MITCHELL A B); | [X]FR2286961 (TEYSSIER HENRI [FR]); | [X]FR2416162 (MOURARET MICHEL [FR]); | [X]US4897995 (GUIRGUIS RAAFAT H [US]) |