EP0563293 - FLOATING SELF-CENTERING TURBINE IMPELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roy E. Roth Company Box 4328 Rock Island, IL 61204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states ROY E. ROTH COMPANY Box 4330 Rock Island, IL 61204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGHARTNER, Leonard, J. Rural Route 1 Coal Valley, IL 61240 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Newby, John Ross JY & GW Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Newby, John Ross J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn London WC1V 6DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92903613.5 | 19.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991US09635 | Priority number, date | US19900632166 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: US 632166 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211459 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563293 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563293 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/04, F16C32/06, F04D23/00, F04D29/26, F04D29/18, F04D29/20, F16C33/10, F04D5/00 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
F04D29/052 (EP,US);
F04D23/008 (EP,US);
F04D29/188 (EP,US);
F04D29/20 (EP,US);
F04D29/266 (EP,US);
F04D5/002 (EP,US);
F16C17/028 (EP,US);
F16C17/047 (EP,US);
F16C33/1075 (EP,US);
F05D2260/35 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | F04D29/04, F16C32/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | SCHWIMMENDES, SELBSTZENTRIERENDES TURBINENRAD | [1993/40] | English: | FLOATING SELF-CENTERING TURBINE IMPELLER | [1993/40] | French: | ROTOR DE TURBINE FLOTTANT A CENTRAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [1993/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 10.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.1997 | BE | 26.03.1997 | DK | 26.03.1997 | ES | 26.03.1997 | NL | 26.03.1997 | SE | 26.06.1997 | LU | 19.12.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
DK | 26.03.1997 | ||
ES | 26.03.1997 | ||
NL | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
DK | 26.03.1997 | ||
ES | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
DK | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR514555 (DUJARDIN & CIE [FR]); | [X]US2604852 (BAKER MILLARD H); | [Y]US2996340 (FRED MACKS ELMER); | [X]FR1534759 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [X]US3518021 (LAKE JOHN E, et al); | [X]FR2224666 (SP K BJUR [SU]); | [A]FR2244088 (DRESSER IND [US]); | [A]AT387440B (ECONOMOS I WARENHANDELSGESELLS [AT]) | International search | [A]US4348065 (YOSHIOKA MASAHIRO, et al); | [X]US4586877 (WATANABE KIYOHIKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4854830 (KOZAWA TADASHI [JP], et al); | [YP]US5000584 (SIMMONS THOMAS E [US]) |