EP0568588 - PAPER NAPKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELLANDER, Wanja Toravägen Herrviksnäs S-139 00 Värmdö / SE | [1993/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Waldinger, Ake AKE WALDINGER PATENTING Vällingbyvägen 57 162 63 Vällingby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Waldinger, Ake Roslinvägen 41 S-161 55 Bromma / SE | Application number, filing date | 92903666.3 | 21.01.1992 | [1993/45] | WO1992SE00037 | Priority number, date | SE19910000171 | 21.01.1991 Original published format: SE 9100171 | [1993/45] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213040 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568588 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568588 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, A47G11/00 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
A47G11/002 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1312 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1315 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1318 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2419 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24215 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24793 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/45] | Title | German: | PAPIERSERVIETTE | [1993/45] | English: | PAPER NAPKIN | [1993/45] | French: | NAPPE EN PAPIER | [1993/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1992 | Translation filed | 16.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.1995 | DK | 15.11.1995 | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/28] | AT | 15.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [X]SE8400363 ; | [A]GB2110073 (COMAN HOWARD PAUL); | [X]WO8707971 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4815457 (MAZARS PAUL [FR], et al) |