EP0565620 - MITOTOXIN FOR TREATMENT OF VASCULAR INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 200 Independence Avenue Washington, DC 20201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states THE SALK INSTITUTE FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDIES 10010 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla California 92037 / US | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY of the DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 200 Independence Avenue Washington, DC 20201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSCELLS, Ward Texas Heart Inst., P.O.Box 20345 Houston, TX 77225-0345 / US | 02 /
LAPPI, Douglas, A. 12842 Caminito de las Olas Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 03 /
BAIRD, J., Andrew 5039 Via Papel San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [1995/38] |
Former [1993/42] | 01 /
CASSCELLS, Ward 3509 "T" Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20007 / US | ||
02 /
LAPPI, Douglas, A. 12842 Caminito de las Olas Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | |||
03 /
BAIRD, J., Andrew 5039 Via Papel San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92903777.8 | 02.01.1992 | [1993/42] | WO1992US00101 | Priority number, date | US19910637074 | 03.01.1991 Original published format: US 637074 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211872 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565620 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565620 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
A61K47/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | MITOTOXIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEFÄSSBESCHÄDIGUNG | [1993/42] | English: | MITOTOXIN FOR TREATMENT OF VASCULAR INJURY | [1993/42] | French: | UTILISATION DE MITOTOXINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LESIONS VASCULAIRES | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0305967 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]US4950483 (KSANDER GEORGE [US], et al); | [X]WO9012597 (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]) | [X] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 160, no. 2, published April 28, 1989, D.A. LAPPI et al. "Bio- logical and Chemical Characterization of Basic FGF-Saporin Mitotoxin", | [X] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Band 160, Nr. 2, 28 April 1989, D.A. LAPPI et al.: "Biological and chemical characterization of basic FGF-Saporin Mitotoxin", pages 917-923, especially page 917; abstract; page 922 |