EP0567535 - IMPROVED HEARING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADELMAN, Roger A. 957 Riverwatch Drive Villa Hills Kentucky 41017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states ADELMAN, Roger A. 957 Riverwatch Drive Villa Hills, Kentucky 41017 / US | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states ADELMAN, Roger A. 1562 Wittlow Place Cincinnati, OH 45224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | ||
Former [2003/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/40] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1993/44] | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92903788.5 | 16.01.1992 | [1993/44] | WO1992US00380 | Priority number, date | US19910642735 | 17.01.1991 Original published format: US 642735 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213430 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567535 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567535 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
H04R19/016 (EP,US);
H04R25/502 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R25/558 (EP,US);
H04R25/656 (EP,US);
H04R2225/025 (EP,US);
H04R2225/51 (EP,US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,US);
H04R2460/13 (EP,US);
H04R2460/15 (EP,US);
H04R25/356 (EP,US);
H04R25/456 (EP,US);
H04R25/654 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES HÖRGERÄT | [1993/44] | English: | IMPROVED HEARING APPARATUS | [1993/44] | French: | PROTHESE AUDITIVE AMELIOREE | [1993/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1993 | Search fee paid | 02.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Request for further processing for: | 21.05.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2003 | Decision despatched | 02.07.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2002 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2003 | BE | 13.08.2003 | FR | 13.08.2003 | IT | 13.08.2003 | NL | 13.08.2003 | GR | 13.11.2003 | SE | 13.11.2003 | ES | 24.11.2003 | LU | 16.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
FR | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
LU | 16.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 13.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4291203 (BELLAFIORE GASPARE) [A] 1,2,18,23 * column 1, lines 46-57; figure 1 *; | [A]WO8900294 (JENSEN BORGE R [BE]) [A] 1,2,18,23-27,37,44 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 21 * * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 10 *; | [PX]WO9115902 (LOTT THOMAS M [US]) [PX] 46 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 9 ** page 8, line 9 - page 12, line 34 * | International search | [XY]US3527901 (GEIB ROBERT L); | [XY]US3746789 (ALCIVAR E, et al); | [Y]US3873784 (DOSCHEK ANTONY Z); | [Y]US4068090 (KOMATSU HIDETOSHI, et al); | [Y]US4150262 (ONO HIROSHI); | [Y]US4329676 (MCDONALD GERALD H, et al); | [Y]US4334315 (ONO HIROSHI, et al); | [Y]US4622692 (COLE WILLIAM A [CA]); | [Y]US4880076 (AHLBERG CARL S [US], et al); | [XY]US4901354 (GOLLMAR KLAUS [DE], et al); | [Y]US4920570 (WEST HENRY L [US], et al) |