EP0565621 - METHOD OF MAKING CAMPTOTHECIN AND CAMPTOTHECIN ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 103 Holladay Hall, Campus Box 7003 Raleigh North Carolina 27695-7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states NORTH CAROLINA STATE UNIVERSITY 103 Holladay Hall, Campus Box 7003 Raleigh, North Carolina 27695-7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMINS, Daniel, L. 1102 Wicklow Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | 02 /
BAEVSKY, Matthew, F. 410 Waldo Street Cary, NC 27511 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 92903792.7 | 18.12.1991 | [1993/42] | WO1991US09598 | Priority number, date | US19900632970 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 632970 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211263 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565621 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565621 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/22, C07D471/22, C07D491/052, C07D215/18, C07D491/04, C07D213/64 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07D215/18 (EP,US);
C07D215/20 (EP,US);
C07D215/233 (EP,US);
C07D215/26 (EP,US);
C07D215/36 (EP,US);
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
C07D215/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/42] | C07D491/22, C07D471/22, C07D491/052, C07D215/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CAMPTOTHECIN UND ANALOGEN CAMPTOTHECINEN | [1993/42] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING CAMPTOTHECIN AND CAMPTOTHECIN ANALOGS | [1993/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CAMPTOTHECINE ET D'ANALOGUES DE CAMPTOTHECINE | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 08.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99112300.1 / EP0963988 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Volume 37, Number 24, published 1972, ROBERT E. LYLE et al., "Benzylic Halogenation of Methylquinolines", see pages 3967-3968. | Examination | - J. Org. Chem., Vol. 38, No. 19, 1973, pages 3268 - 3271, R.E. Lyle et al. |