EP0572439 - SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES FOR SPECIFYING CUSTOMIZED TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC. 290 West Mt. Pleasant Avenue Livingston, New Jersey 07039-2729 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABSON, David, Leveau, III 275 Edgeware Court Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
BAJZATH, James, Andrew, Jr. 15 McCay Drive Roebling, NJ 08554 / US | 03 /
ELY, Thomas, Chambers 1178 Delaware Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92903837.0 | 16.12.1991 | [1993/49] | WO1991US09457 | Priority number, date | US19900629373 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629373 | US19900629390 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629390 | US19900629371 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629371 | US19900629447 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629447 | US19900629389 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629389 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211603 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572439 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/62, G06F15/18, G06F15/38, H04Q3/00, H04M3/42, G06F9/44 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP);
H04M3/42144 (EP);
H04Q3/0016 (EP);
H04Q3/0033 (EP);
H04M3/428 (EP);
H04M3/436 (EP);
H04Q2213/135 (EP);
H04Q2213/13501 (EP);
H04Q2213/13503 (EP);
H04Q2213/13525 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/49] | G06F15/62, G06F15/18, G06F15/38 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG ANGEPASSTER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTE | [1993/49] | English: | SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES FOR SPECIFYING CUSTOMIZED TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICES | [1993/49] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR SPECIFIER DES SERVICES DE TELECOMMUNICATION PERSONNALISES | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 21.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/20] | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4611094 ; | [E]WO9211724 | [Y] - HOLMGREN C., MAN S. K. K., "PLANNER, THE NETWORK SERVICES PLANNING TOOL.", COMMUNICATIONS FOR THE INFORMATION AGE. HOLLYWOOD, NOV. 28 - DEC. 1, 1988., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19881128), VOL. 3 OF 3., no. 1988., pages 1697 - 1701., XP000014521 | [A] - AKIRA MIURA, KIYOMI SATO., "EVALUATION OF HIERARCHICAL NETWORK DATA MANAGEMENT & CALL CONTROL ARCHITECTURE.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT NETWORKS. BORDEAUX, 14 - 17 MARCH, 1989., PARIS, SEE., FR, FR, (19890314), vol. CONF. 1, pages 14 - 18., XP000130055 | International search | [Y]US4827404 ; | [YE]US5084813 ; | [AP]US5019961 ; | [A]US4860204 |