EP0574413 - AQUEOUS TEXTILE AUXILIARY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTH, Christian Rheinstrasse 25 CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | 02 /
STEHLIN, Albert 6, rue de Bougue F-68300 Rosenau / FR | 03 /
KRÖHNKE, Christoph Kleingasse 23 D-7814 Breisach-Oberrimsingen / DE | [1993/51] | Application number, filing date | 92903964.2 | 12.02.1992 | [1993/51] | WO1992EP00299 | Priority number, date | CH19910000638 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: CH 63891 | [1993/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215664 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574413 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574413 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D1/72, C11D1/722, D06L3/02, D06L1/14, D06M15/263, D06M15/356 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
C11D3/0026 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/721 (EP,US);
C11D1/722 (EP,US);
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
D06L1/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/51] | C11D3/37, C11D1/72, C11D1/722, D06L3/02, D06L1/14, D06M15/263, D06M15/356, C08G65/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/51] | Title | German: | WASSRIGE TEXTILHILFSMITTELGEMISCHE | [1993/51] | English: | AQUEOUS TEXTILE AUXILIARY COMPOSITION | [1993/51] | French: | COMPOSITION AUXILIAIRE TEXTILE AQUEUSE | [1993/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.1996 | BE | 05.06.1996 | DK | 05.06.1996 | GR | 05.06.1996 | NL | 05.06.1996 | SE | 05.09.1996 | LU | 28.02.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
DK | 05.06.1996 | ||
GR | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
DK | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 05.06.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1954080 (HOECHST AG); | [A]FR2107169 (DEGUSSA); | [A]US3960781 (FREIS RICHARD E, et al); | [A]FR2342365 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [A]GB2075038 (ICI LTD); | [A]EP0055818 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]); | [A]EP0114788 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]GB2151252 (SANDOZ LTD); | [X]EP0299691 (DIVERSEY CORP [CA]); | [X]EP0335404 (LION CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0354344 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]EP0360736 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]EP0308221 |