EP0567551 - DEVICE FOR CAUSING AN UNTUNED STRUCTURE TO VIBRATE ULTRASONICALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUBRUQUE, Dominique 644, chemin des Farnaises F-74380 Bonne-sur-Menoge / FR | [1993/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Ahner, Francis CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92904057.4 | 16.01.1992 | [1993/44] | WO1992FR00033 | Priority number, date | FR19910000496 | 17.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100496 | [1993/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212807 | Date: | 06.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567551 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567551 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B06B3/00 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B07B1/40 (EP,US);
B06B3/00 (EP,US);
B07B2230/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR DAS MIT ULTRASCHALL ERSCHÜTTERN EINER NICHTRESONIERENDER STRUKTUR | [1993/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR CAUSING AN UNTUNED STRUCTURE TO VIBRATE ULTRASONICALLY | [1993/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN VIBRATION ULTRASONIQUE D'UNE STRUCTURE NON ACCORDEE | [1993/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Request for further processing for: | 08.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3628071 (HARRIS EVERETT A, et al); | [A]FR2233108 (RUSSEL FINEX [GB]); | [A]DE2424007 (SITEG SIEBTECH GMBH); | [A]GB2167270 (LUCAS IND PLC); | [A]DE3813176 (TAGA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) |