EP0563325 - FLUID CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.1999 [1999/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC. Patent Section, M.S. 077 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403-5011 / US | [1993/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMAREST, Scott, W. 3610 Riverbend Drive Racine, WI 53404 / US | 02 /
BUHLER, James, E. 31308 Red Oak Lane Waterford, WI 53185 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Allen, D. 6008 Independence Road Racine, WI 53406 / US | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Ruschke & Partner Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92904370.1 | 17.12.1991 | [1993/40] | WO1991US09444 | Priority number, date | US19900629517 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: US 629517 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211481 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563325 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/06, F16K21/00, B05B11/06, B05B7/24, B05B7/12 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B05B11/06 (EP,US);
B05B7/12 (EP,US);
B05B7/2429 (EP,US);
B67D3/041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | F16K7/06, F16K21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | FLUIDUMREGELVENTIL | [1993/40] | English: | FLUID CONTROL VALVE | [1993/40] | French: | VANNE DE REGULATION DE FLUIDE | [1993/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/13] | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1994 | 31.12.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.1996 | 31.12.1998 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9206793 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [E] 1,2 * page 7, line 38 - page 10, line 19; figures 13,14 *; | [Y]US3157360 (HEARD WILLIAM L) [Y] 1,2 * column W *; | [Y]DE8705600U (ROTRING-WERKE RIEPE KG) [Y] 1,2 * page 13, line 9 - page 15, line 27; figures 9-12 *; | [A]US2575632 (ELMER LIPMAN); | [A]US3632046 (HENGESBACH ROBERT W); | [A]GB336123 (T J HOLMES COMPANY INC) | International search | [X]US1920261 (LAVENDER ROBERT A); | [X]US2992761 (SOMMERS SR EDWARD P); | [X]US3384276 (HENNINGFIELD ROBERT F); | [A]US4460101 (TSENG BANG-TSAI [TW]); | [A]US4911336 (BLAKE WILLIAM S [US]); | [A]US4726496 (DOLAN JOHN E [US]); | [A]US3539081 (NORTON ROBERT L, et al) |