EP0572455 - SUBSTITUTED PYRIDINONES AND PYRIMIDINONES AS ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | Change - designated states | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Pharmaceuticals Limited Home Park Kings Langley, Herts WD4 8DH / GB | [1995/46] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states FISONS plc Fison House Princes Street Ipswich Suffolk IP1 1QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANTICK, John Raymond 78 Melton Road, Burton on the Wolds Loughborough Leicestershire LE12 5HG / GB | 02 /
McINALLY, Thomas 17 Belvoir Drive Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 2SN / GB | 03 /
TINKER, Alan Charles 97 Knightthorpe Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0JR / GB | 04 /
HIRST, Simon Christopher 1 Blake Road West Bridgford Nottingham NG2 5JJ / GB | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al Astra Patents PO Box 86 Loughborough, Leics. LE11 ORJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae, et al Astra Patents PO Box 86 Loughborough, Leics. LE11 ORJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904509.4 | 17.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992GB00280 | Priority number, date | GB19910003326 | 16.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9103326 | GB19910012975 | 15.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9112975 | GB19910013492 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9113492 | GB19910014829 | 10.07.1991 Original published format: GB 9114829 | GB19910020677 | 28.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9120677 | GB19910024168 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9124168 | GB19910025059 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: GB 9125059 | GB19910026575 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126575 | GB19910026573 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126573 | GB19920000101 | 04.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9200101 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214714 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572455 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/36, C07D213/64, C07D213/69, C07D213/80, C07D213/82, C07D215/22, C07D401/10, C07D401/12 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/38 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D213/69 (EP);
C07D213/80 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D215/22 (EP);
C07D239/36 (EP);
C07D401/10 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D403/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] |
Former [1993/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIDINONE UND PYRIMIDINONE ALS ANGIOTENSIN-II-ANTAGONISTEN | [1993/49] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRIDINONES AND PYRIMIDINONES AS ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONISTS | [1993/49] | French: | PYRIDINONES ET PYRIMIDINONES SUBSTITUES UTILISES COMME ANTAGONISTES D'ANGIOTENSINE II | [1993/49] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/34: Verbunden mit 92301283.5/0500297 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 18.04.94 | EPB 1994/34: Consolidated with 92301283.5/0500297 (european application no./publication no.) by decision dated 18.04.94 | EPB 1994/34: Jointe à la demande no. 92301283.5/0500297 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 18.04.94 | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 27.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/17] | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0407342 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0411766 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [AP]EP0434249 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 17, 27 April 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 174009P, K. KATANO ET AL.: 'Preparation of pyridine derivatives as angiotensin II antagonists.' page 848 ; |