EP0516840 - AUTOMATIC SCREEN BLANKING IN A MOBILE RADIO DATA TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYMOND, William, D. 17673 24th Avenue Surrey, British Columbia V3S 5J9 / CA | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1992/50] | Hudson, Peter David MOTOROLA European Intellectual Property Operations Jays Close Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hants RG22 4PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904519.3 | 19.12.1991 | [1992/50] | WO1991US09655 | Priority number, date | US19900630644 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: US 630644 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9211624 | Date: | 09.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516840 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/02 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G08G1/091 (EP,US);
G08G1/0967 (EP,US);
H04M1/6041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/50] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES WEGBLENDEN EINER ANZEIGE IN EINEM MOBILFUNKDATENENDGERÄT | [1992/50] | English: | AUTOMATIC SCREEN BLANKING IN A MOBILE RADIO DATA TERMINAL | [1992/50] | French: | OCCULTATION AUTOMATIQUE DE L'ECRAN DANS UN TERMINAL INFORMATIQUE RADIOELECTRIQUE MOBILE | [1992/50] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1992 | Search fee paid | 17.09.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/49] | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60165177 ; | [Y]JP57160234 ; | [A]JP63115440 ; | [XP]EP0450192 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 001 (E-371)7 January 1986 & JP-A-60 165 177 ( SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO KK ) 28 August 1985, & JP60165177 A 19850828 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 264 (E-150)23 December 1982 & JP-A-57 160 234 ( NIPPON DENKI KK ) 2 October 1982, & JP57160234 A 19821002 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 362 (E-663)28 September 1988 & JP-A-63 115 440 ( NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD ) 20 May 1988, & JP63115440 A 19880520 | [A] - FUNKSCHAU. no. 2, 1984, MUNCHEN DE pages 41 - 44 R. LODDE 'MOBIL IM KONTAKT MIT DEM GROSSRECHNER' | International search | [A]US4843622 (YOTSUTANI AKIO [JP], et al); | [AP]US5032828 (HIROSE SATORU [JP], et al) |