EP0572456 - SIGNAL PROCESSING ARRANGEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOMAIN DYNAMICS LIMITED 7-9 Irwell Terrace GB-Bacup Lancashire OL13 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states DOMAIN DYNAMICS LIMITED 7-9 Irwell Terrace GB-Bacup Lancashire OL13 9AJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states King, Reginald Alfred 17 Vicarage Lane Shrivenham, Oxfordshire SN6 8DT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Reginald Alfred 17 Vicarage Lane Shrivenham, Oxfordshire SN6 8DT / GB | [1995/39] |
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1999/16] | Atkinson, Ralph Atkinson & Co, 1st Floor, Unit A, The Technology Park, Shirland Lane Sheffield S9 3PA / GB | ||
Former [1993/49] | Lawrence, Brian Richard 59 Shenfield Place Shenfield Brentwood Essex CM15 9AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904530.0 | 18.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992GB00285 | Priority number, date | GB19910003349 | 18.02.1991 Original published format: GB 9103349 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215089 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572456 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572456 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G10L7/08, G10L9/06, G10L5/06 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
G10L17/02 (EP,US);
G06N3/04 (EP,US);
G10L15/16 (EP,US);
G10L17/18 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR SIGNALVERARBEITUNG | [1993/49] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING ARRANGEMENTS | [1993/49] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 21.10.1996 | Observations by third parties | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2000
23.10.2000
ADMISSIBLE Secretary of State for Defence, Defence Evaluation and Research Agency Ively Road Farnborough, HANTS GU14 0LX / GB Opponent's representative Williams, Arthur Wyn Spencer, et al, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.07.2000
Secretary of State for Defence, Defence Evaluation and Research Agency Ively Road Farnborough, HANTS GU14 0LX / GB Opponent's representative Williams, Arthur Wyn Spencer, et al, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | 26.10.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.06.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.12.2005 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.02.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1999 | CH | 13.10.1999 | GR | 13.10.1999 | LI | 13.10.1999 | LU | 18.02.2000 | ES | 19.02.2004 | SE | 19.02.2004 | BE | 28.02.2004 | DK | 01.03.2004 | DE | 01.09.2004 | NL | 01.09.2004 | FR | 29.10.2004 | IT | 18.02.2005 | [2007/34] |
Former [2006/27] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
ES | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2004 | ||
DE | 01.09.2004 | ||
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
ES | 19.02.2004 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2004 | ||
DE | 01.09.2004 | ||
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
GB | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
DK | 01.03.2004 | ||
DE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
DE | 01.09.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
DE | 01.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
SE | 19.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
LU | 18.02.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
CH | 18.01.2000 | ||
LI | 18.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 18.01.2000 | |
LI | 18.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0141497 (KING REGINALD ALFRED); | [A]EP0285352 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [AP]EP0435282 (SHARP KK [JP]) |