EP0569489 - A SYSTEM FOR RESISTING LIMB MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [1993/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAXWELL, Scott, M. 250 Mercer Street, C317 New York, NY 10012 / US | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92904990.6 | 16.01.1992 | [1993/46] | WO1992US00369 | Priority number, date | US19910648733 | 31.01.1991 Original published format: US 648733 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9213504 | Date: | 20.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569489 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569489 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01, B25J13/08, G05B13/00 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
A61F5/0102 (EP,US);
B25J13/088 (EP,US);
B25J19/0004 (EP,US);
B25J9/1615 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40305 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45172 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM WIDERSTANDLEISTEN GEGEN GLIEDMASSENBEWEGUNGEN | [1993/46] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR RESISTING LIMB MOVEMENT | [1993/46] | French: | SYSTEME RESTREIGNANT LES MOUVEMENTS D'UN MEMBRE | [1993/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 14.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 01.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 10.05.1995 | GR | 10.05.1995 | LI | 10.05.1995 | MC | 10.05.1995 | LU | 31.01.1996 | [2013/51] |
Former [2003/18] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
GR | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
MC | 10.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2003/17] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
GR | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
MC | 16.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
GR | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
MC | 10.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
GR | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
LI | 10.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4237873 (HOYT LAURANCE J SR [US], et al); | [A]FR2541574 (SERAM [FR]); | [A]WO8504796 (SVENSK HANDIKAPPTEKNIK [SE]); | [A]US4760850 (PHILLIPS CHANDLER A [US], et al); | [A]FR2624002 (MONGE LYCEE TECH [FR], et al); | [A]EP0380060 (SINGER ROBERT D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4237873 |