EP0576440 - A LASER WARNING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT 172 90 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT S-172 90 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT S-172 90 Sundbyberg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLANDER, Göran Blästadsgatan 45 S-582 62 Linköping / SE | 02 /
NISSBORG, Kurt Solbacka Skeppsas S-596 00 Skänninge / SE | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Hedefält, Dag, et al Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten S-115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92905056.5 | 14.02.1992 | [1994/01] | WO1992SE00091 | Priority number, date | SE19910000455 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: SE 9100455 | [1994/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215024 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576440 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/782 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
G01S7/4804 (EP,US);
G01S3/782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/01] | Title | German: | LASERWARNVORRICHTUNG | [1994/01] | English: | A LASER WARNING DEVICE | [1994/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AVERTISSEMENT D'EXPOSITION AUX RADIATIONS LASER | [1994/01] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1993 | Translation filed | 06.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/37] | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP60205381 ; | [Y]GB1482753 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [A]DE2714178 (PRECITRONIC) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 10, No. 64, P436; & JP,A,60 205 381 publ 1985-10-16 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO K.K.)., & JP60205381 A 00000000 |