EP0572484 - A DENSE, SELF-REINFORCED SILICON NITRIDE CERAMIC PREPARED BY PRESSURELESS OR LOW PRESSURE GAS SINTERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYZIK, Aleksander, J. 1213 Wakefield Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Burford, Anthony Frederick W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92905364.3 | 06.01.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992US00082 | Priority number, date | US19910657715 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: US 657715 | [1993/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9214685 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572484 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572484 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
C04B35/593 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/584 (EP,US);
C04B35/5935 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | DURCH DRUCKLOSES ODER NIEDRIGDRUCKGASSINTERN HERGESTELLTE DICHTE, SELBSTARMIERTE SILICIUMNITRIDKERAMIK | [1993/49] | English: | A DENSE, SELF-REINFORCED SILICON NITRIDE CERAMIC PREPARED BY PRESSURELESS OR LOW PRESSURE GAS SINTERING | [1993/49] | French: | CERAMIQUE DENSE A AZOTURE DE SILICIUM AUTO-RENFORCEE PREPAREE PAR FRITTAGE SANS PRESSION OU AU GAZ A BASSE PRESSION | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0272066 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US5021372 (PYZIK ALEKSANDER J [US], et al) |