EP0530337 - MULTIPOINT PLUGS FOR COMMON ELECTRICAL CONTACTING OF A PLURALITY OF ELECTRICALLY OPERATED FUEL INJECTION VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GMELIN, Karl Eichendorffweg 5 D-7101 Flein / DE | 02 /
GREGORIUS, Thomas Obertorstr. 29 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | [1993/10] | Application number, filing date | 92905557.2 | 20.02.1992 | [1993/10] | WO1992DE00120 | Priority number, date | DE19914109653 | 23.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109653 | [1993/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216736 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530337 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530337 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/00 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
H01R13/66 (EP,US);
F02D41/3005 (EP,US);
F02M51/005 (EP,US);
F02M69/465 (EP,US);
F02D2400/21 (EP,US);
F02M55/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/10] | Title | German: | KONTAKTIERUNGSLEISTE ZUR GEMEINSAMEN ELEKTRISCHEN KONTAKTIERUNG MEHRERER ELEKTRISCH BETÄTIGBARER BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTILE | [1993/10] | English: | MULTIPOINT PLUGS FOR COMMON ELECTRICAL CONTACTING OF A PLURALITY OF ELECTRICALLY OPERATED FUEL INJECTION VALVES | [1993/10] | French: | REGLETTE POUR LA MISE EN CONTACT ELECTRIQUE COMMUNE DE PLUSIEURS INJECTEURS DE CARBURANT A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE | [1993/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2073316 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US4570601 (ITO MASAKI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3725980 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]EP0302608 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0306739 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0374422 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]DE8903551U ; | [A]WO9013740 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0416834 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP], et al) |