EP0573504 - POWER-GENERATOR UNIT WITH COOLED CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAKATEC GBR Industriestrasse 1, Neermoor 26802 Moormerland / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states CHAKATEC GBR Industriestrasse 1, Neermoor D-26802 Moormerland / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirges, Gerhard O. Quittenweg 40a 22175 Hamburg / DE | [1996/01] |
Former [1993/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vonnemann, Gerhard, et al VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | Vonnemann, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner An der Alster 84 D-20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92905572.1 | 27.02.1992 | [1993/50] | WO1992EP00412 | Priority number, date | DE19914106497 | 01.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4106497 | [1993/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216042 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573504 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573504 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/18, H02K9/19, F04D13/02, F01P5/10 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
H02K9/19 (EP,US);
F01P5/10 (EP,US);
F02B63/04 (EP,US);
F04D13/02 (EP,US);
F04D13/024 (EP,US);
H02K7/1815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/50] | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGER MIT KERNKÜHLUNG | [1993/50] | English: | POWER-GENERATOR UNIT WITH COOLED CORE | [1993/50] | French: | GENERATRICE ELECTRIQUE AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT DU NOYAU | [1993/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.01.1996 | NL | 03.01.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 03.01.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP51118028 ; | [A]US3046899 (ERNST BIEFANG); | [Y]US4486668 (ASAHI TARO [JP], et al); | [A]DE8601003U ; | [A]DE3534507 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]); | [Y]US4827147 (MIZUSHIMA SADAO [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1, no. 20 (E-76)24. März 1977 & JP,A,51 118 028 ( KUBOTA TEKKO ) 16. Oktober 1976, & JP51118028 A 00000000 |