EP0572503 - PAPER SHEETS HAVING SEVERAL DISTINCT LAYERS WITH MARKINGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/49] | PAPER SHEETS HAVING SEVERAL DISTINCT LAYERS WITH MARKINGS, PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING THEM | ||
[1995/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAYSERSBERG Route de Lapoutroie F-68240 Kaysersberg / FR | [1993/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUPPEL, Rémy 3, rue des Vosges F-68320 Durrenentzen / FR | 02 /
LAURENT, Pierre 42, rue Clémenceau F-68000 Colmar / FR | 03 /
HUNGLER, Joel 5, rue des Tilleuls F-68320 Urschenheim / FR | [1995/51] |
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
RUPPEL, Rémy 3, rue des Vosges F-68320 Durrenentzen / FR | ||
02 /
LAURENT, Pierre 42, rue Clémenceau F-68000 Colmar / FR | |||
03 /
HUNGLER, Jo[l 5, rue des Tilleuls F-68320 Urschenheim / FR | Representative(s) | David, Daniel, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | David, Daniel, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/34] | David, Daniel, et al KAYSERSBERG, Service Propriété Industrielle, 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/49] | David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG Service Propriété Industrielle 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92905806.3 | 13.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992FR00137 | Priority number, date | FR19910002003 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9102003 | [1993/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214605 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572503 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572503 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B31F5/00 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
B32B3/30 (EP,US);
B31F1/07 (EP,US);
B31F5/04 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (US);
B32B38/06 (EP,US);
D21H27/02 (EP,US);
D21H27/40 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0728 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0738 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0756 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0766 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0787 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0792 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1023 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24446 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24463 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄGEN UND KASCHIEREN VON PAPIER, SOWIE ERHALTENES PRODUKT | [1995/51] | English: | PAPER SHEETS HAVING SEVERAL DISTINCT LAYERS WITH MARKINGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM | [1995/51] | French: | FEUILLES DE PAPIER MULTICOUCHES PRESENTANT DES MARQUAGES ET PROCEDE POUR LEUR ELABORATION | [1995/51] |
Former [1993/49] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÄGEN UND KASCHIEREN VON PAPIER, SOWIE ERHALTENES PRODUKT | ||
Former [1993/49] | PAPER SHEETS HAVING SEVERAL DISTINCT LAYERS WITH MARKINGS, PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING THEM | ||
Former [1993/49] | FEUILLES DE PAPIER MULTICOUCHES PRESENTANT DES MARQUAGES, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LEUR ELABORATION | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.1995 | DK | 20.12.1995 | GR | 20.12.1995 | MC | 20.12.1995 | CH | 29.02.1996 | LI | 29.02.1996 | LU | 29.02.1996 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
GR | 20.12.1995 | ||
MC | 13.02.1996 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
GR | 20.12.1995 | ||
MC | 20.12.1995 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
GR | 20.12.1995 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
LU | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DK | 20.12.1995 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 20.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB646735 (FREDERICK RICHARD ROWLEY); | [A]US3134980 (ALEXANDER ROBERT C); | [A]GB1059746 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO); | [A]GB1420139 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO); | [A]FR2508845 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]EP0265298 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]); | [A]EP0340334 (DRESCHER GESCHAEFTSDRUCKE); | [A]EP0408248 (JAMES RIVER CORP [US]) |