EP0639557 - TRIALKYLAMINE DERIVATIVE AND AMELIORANT FOR DIGESTIVE TRACT MOVEMENT CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZERIA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 10-11, Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0024 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states ZERIA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 10-11, Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTO, Yoshiaki, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd., Cent. Res. Laboratories, 2512-1, Aza Numagami, Oaza Oshikiri Konan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | 02 /
ICHIKAWA, Hiromi, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd, Cent. Res. Laboratories, 2512-1, Aza Numagami, Oaza Oshikiri Konan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | 03 /
OGURA, Kuniyoshi, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd, Cent. Res. Laboratories, 2512-1, Aza Numagami, Oaza Oshikiri Konan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | 04 /
CHAKI, Kyoji, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd, Cent. Res. Laboratories, 2512-1, Aza Numagami, OazaOshikiri Konaan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | 05 /
SEIKI, Masao, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd, Cent. Res. Laboratories, 2512-1, Aza Numagami, OazaOshikiri Konaan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | 06 /
TAKEMASA, Toshihiko, Zeria Pharm. Co. Ltd, Central Res. Lab., 2512-1, Aza Numagami, Oaza Oshikiri Konan-machi, Osato-gun, Saitama 360-01 / JP | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92905994.7 | 06.03.1992 | [1995/08] | WO1992JP00270 | Priority number, date | JP19910065306 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6530691 | [1995/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215553 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639557 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/52, C07C219/24, C07D215/42, C07D307/78, C07D311/68, C07D333/54, C07D333/80, C07D335/06, C07D491/048, C07D493/04, C07D307/79, C07D311/58, C07D307/82, C07D333/78, C07D215/06, C07C215/44, A61K31/34, A61K31/35, A61K31/38, A61K31/435, A61K31/47 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP,US);
C07D333/04 (KR);
A61K31/34 (KR);
C07C215/42 (EP,US);
C07C217/52 (EP,US);
C07C219/24 (EP,US);
C07D215/06 (EP,US);
C07D215/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/82 (EP,US);
C07D311/58 (EP,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,US);
C07D333/78 (EP,US);
C07D333/80 (EP,US);
C07D335/06 (EP,US);
C07C2602/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | TRIALKYLAMIN-DERIVATE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER MOTIZITÄT DES VERDAUUNGSTRAKTES | [1995/08] | English: | TRIALKYLAMINE DERIVATIVE AND AMELIORANT FOR DIGESTIVE TRACT MOVEMENT CONTAINING THE SAME | [1995/08] | French: | DERIVE DE TRIALKYLAMINE ET ADJUVANT DE MOTILITE DE L'APPAREIL DIGESTIF LE CONTENANT | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1993 | Translation filed | 07.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.09.1993 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/49] | 18.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS5384955 (SANDOZ AG); | [A]DE2803582 (SANDOZ AG); | [A]CH637363 (SANDOZ AG [CH]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 110, No. 15, Abstract No. 128064f, ABOUL-ENEIN, M.N. et al., "Esters of 1-(Dimethylamino)-1-Indanand 1,2,3,4-Tetrahydro-1-Naphthalene Methanol as Antispasmodics, Antiulcer Drugs, and Local Anaesthetics", Sci. Pharm., 56(4)243-50(1988). | [A] - J. Med. Chem., Vol. 16, No. 9, (1973), SARGES, REINHARD et al., "5,8-Disubstituted 1-Aminotetralins. Class of Compounds with a Novel Profile of Central Nervous System Activity", p. 1003-1011. |