EP0529096 - METHOD OF MAKING LUMPS OF FRIED CHINESE VERMICELLI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSIN SHOKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1-1 Nishinakajima Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states NISSIN SHOKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-1-1 Nishinakajima Yodogawa-ku Osaka 532 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Kenkichi, 6-1-502, Kamihozumi 4-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
YAMAYA, Tatsuo, 479-13, Imajukucho Moriyama-shi Shiga 524 / JP | 03 /
HIRATA, Toshinari, 14-40, Kusatsu 3-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525 / JP | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Rackham, Anthony Charles, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92906249.5 | 28.02.1992 | [1993/09] | WO1992JP00240 | Priority number, date | JP19910036240 | 01.03.1991 Original published format: JP 3624091 | [1993/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215202 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529096 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529096 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16, A23L1/162, A47J37/12 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
A47J37/1214 (EP,KR,US);
A23L7/111 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FRITIERTEN CHINESISCHEN FADENNUDELNKLUMPEN | [1993/09] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING LUMPS OF FRIED CHINESE VERMICELLI | [1993/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION EN BLOC DE VERMICELLES FRITS A LA CHINOISE | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1992 | Translation filed | 29.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1992 | Search fee paid | 29.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.1995 | DK | 17.05.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/04] | BE | 17.05.1995 | |
SE | 17.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]JP04030763 | [YP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 198 (C-0939)13 May 1992 & JP-A-04 030763 ( TOOKIYOO MENKI KK ) 3 February 1992, & JP04030763 A 19920203 | International search | [Y]JPS5743224B ; | [Y]JPH0156771B |