EP0575402 - PROCESS FOR COOLING DRIVE COMPONENTS AND HEATING THE PASSENGER COMPARTMENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN VEHICLE, AND ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPLEMENTING THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURK, Roland Schafbergstrasse 10 D-7014 Kornwestheim / DE | 02 /
HECKENBERGER, Thomas Am Eulenberg 8 D-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
KRAUSS, Hans-Joachim Balinger Strasse 22 D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | 04 /
LÖHLE, Michael Alte Steige 21/2 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Riedel, Peter, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalts-Kanzlei Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Riedel, Peter, et al c/o Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | Jackisch, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt W. Jackisch & Partner Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Riedel, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Behr GmbH & Co., Patentabteilung, Postfach 30 09 20 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92906258.6 | 03.03.1992 | [1993/52] | WO1992EP00466 | Priority number, date | DE19914108958 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108958 | [1993/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216389 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575402 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575402 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/03, B60H1/00 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
B60H1/034 (EP,US);
B60H1/00392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG VON ANTRIEBSKOMPONENTEN UND ZUR HEIZUNG EINES FAHRGASTRAUMES EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES, INSBESONDERE EINES ELEKTROMOBILS, UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1993/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR COOLING DRIVE COMPONENTS AND HEATING THE PASSENGER COMPARTMENT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, ESPECIALLY AN ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN VEHICLE, AND ARRANGEMENT FOR IMPLEMENTING THE PROCESS | [1993/52] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT D'ELEMENTS MOTEURS ET POUR LE CHAUFFAGE DE L'HABITACLE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, EN PARTICULIER D'UN VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA REALISATION DU PROCEDE | [1993/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.03.1996 | LI | 31.03.1996 | [1997/29] | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE9001590U ; | [Y]US1880493 (RUNDLETT CARL W); | [A]DE2006802 ; | [A]EP0008384 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE2451221 (ELEKTR STRASSENVERKEHR GES); | [A]US4220197 (GAGNON JOSEPH A M [US], et al); | [A]US2780077 (JACOBS JAMES W) |