EP0575410 - SELECTION OF SPECIFIC PROTEINS BY A BIOLOGICAL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/52] | THE BIOLOGICAL SELECTION OF USEFUL MOLECULES | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRADBURY, Andrew Raymon Morton 19 Campdale Road London N7 OEB / GB | [1993/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92906372.5 | 09.03.1992 | [1993/52] | WO1992GB00419 | Priority number, date | GB19910004801 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9104801 | GB19920001127 | 20.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9201127 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215702 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575410 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575410 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/02, G01N33/566, C12Q1/70, G01N33/68, C12N15/73, C12N15/13, C12N15/70 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
C40B30/04 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP);
C12N15/73 (EP);
C12Q1/025 (EP);
C12Q1/70 (EP);
G01N33/6845 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/52] | Title | German: | AUSWAHL SPEZIFISCHER PROTEINE DURCH EIN BIOLOGISCHES VERFAHREN | [1998/19] | English: | SELECTION OF SPECIFIC PROTEINS BY A BIOLOGICAL METHOD | [1998/19] | French: | SELECTION DE PROTEINS SPECIFIQUES PAR UNE METHODE BIOLOGIQUE | [1998/19] |
Former [1993/52] | Biologische Auslese von nützlichen Molekülen | ||
Former [1993/52] | THE BIOLOGICAL SELECTION OF USEFUL MOLECULES | ||
Former [1993/52] | SELECTION BIOLOGIQUE DE MOLECULES UTILES | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 21.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Request for further processing for: | 16.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.1994 | 31.03.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 19.05.1999 | FR | 19.05.1999 | IT | 19.05.1999 | LI | 19.05.1999 | DK | 19.08.1999 | DE | 20.08.1999 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 19.05.1999 | |
FR | 19.05.1999 | ||
LI | 19.05.1999 | ||
DK | 19.08.1999 | ||
DE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | CH | 19.05.1999 | |
LI | 19.05.1999 | ||
DK | 19.08.1999 | ||
DE | 20.08.1999 | ||
FR | 15.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 19.05.1999 | |
LI | 19.05.1999 | ||
DE | 20.08.1999 | ||
FR | 15.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | DE | 20.08.1999 | |
CH | 24.08.1999 | ||
LI | 24.08.1999 | ||
FR | 15.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | DE | 20.08.1999 | |
FR | 15.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/20] | DE | 20.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2034717 ; | [AP]WO9118980 ; | [AP]WO9117271 | [X] - SCIENCE. vol. 249, 27 July 1990, LANCASTER, PA US pages 386 - 390; J.K.SCOTT ET AL.: 'Searching for peptide ligands with an epitope library' | [X] - GENE. vol. 70, 30 October 1988, AMSTERDAM NL pages 181 - 189; A.CHARBIT ET AL.: 'Versatility of a vector for expressing foreign polypeptides at the surface of Gram-negative bacteria' cited in the application | [T] - NATURE. vol. 352, 15 August 1991, LONDON GB pages 624 - 628; T.CLACKSON ET AL.: 'Making antibody fragment using phage display libraries' |