EP0524307 - CALIBRATION METHOD FOR AUTOMATED ASSAY INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRING DIAGNOSTICS INC. 151 University Avenue Westwood, MA 02090-2399 / US | [1995/17] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states PB Diagnostic Systems, Inc. 151 University Avenue Westwood, MA 02090-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Ernest, W. 141 Commerford Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 92906709.8 | 03.02.1992 | [1993/04] | WO1992US00834 | Priority number, date | US19910654877 | 13.02.1991 Original published format: US 654877 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215017 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524307 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524307 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
G01N35/1011 (EP,US);
G01N2035/103 (EP,US);
G01N35/109 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/04] | G01N35/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERVERFAHREN FÜR EIN AUTOMATISCHES ANALYSEGERÄT | [1995/22] | English: | CALIBRATION METHOD FOR AUTOMATED ASSAY INSTRUMENT | [1993/04] | French: | PROCEDE D'ETALONNAGE POUR INSTRUMENT DE DOSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [1993/04] |
Former [1993/04] | Kalibrirverfahren für ein automatisches Analysegerät | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 31.05.1995 | [2000/05] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4478094 (SALOMAA KARI [US], et al); | [A]US4757437 (NISHIMURA TAKASHI [JP]); | [AP]US5055263 (MELTZER WALTER [US]) |