EP0529102 - TERMINALLY MODIFIED POLYOLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonen Corporation 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1993/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Naomi, Corporate Res. & Dev. Labororatory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka1-chomeo Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 / JP | 02 /
USUI, Miyuki, Corporate Res. & Dev. Laboratory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama354 / JP | 03 /
FURUHASHI, Hiroyuki, Corporate Res. & Dev. Labor. of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 / JP | 04 /
UEKI, Satoshi, Corporate Res. & Dev. Laboratory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 / JP | [1998/44] |
Former [1993/09] | 01 /
KOYAMA, Naomi, Corporate Res. & Dev. Labororatory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka1-chomeo Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 am / JP | ||
02 /
USUI, Miyuki, Corporate Res. & Dev. Laboratory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama354 / JP | |||
03 /
FURUHASHI, Hiroyuki, Corporate Res. & Dev. Labor. of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 / JP | |||
04 /
UEKI, Satoshi, Corporate Res. & Dev. Laboratory of Tonen Corporation, 3-1, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Ooi-machi, Iruma-gun, Saitama 354 / JP | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92906723.9 | 13.03.1992 | [1993/09] | WO1992JP00308 | Priority number, date | JP19910051389 | 15.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5138991 | JP19910052639 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5263991 | JP19910052640 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5264091 | JP19910052641 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5264191 | JP19910293213 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29321391 | [1993/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216566 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529102 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529102 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F8/18, C08F8/30, C08F10/06, C08F4/685 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/09] | Title | German: | ENDSTÄNDIG MODIFIZIERTES POLYOLEFIN | [1993/09] | English: | TERMINALLY MODIFIED POLYOLEFIN | [1993/09] | French: | POLYOLEFINE MODIFIEE EN FIN DE CHAINE | [1993/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1992 | Translation filed | 01.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1992 | Search fee paid | 01.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0370753 ; | [Y]EP0188915 ; | [Y]EP0234114 ; | [A]EP0329891 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 26, 27 December 1971, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 152609s, AIJIMA, TOSHIO 'MODIFIED POLYOLEFIN COMPOSITES' page 37 ;column 1 ; | International search | [X]JPH02140202 ; | [X]JPH02140212 |