EP0580610 - VEHICLE AND BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOTHWELL, Peter William "Meoncote" 114 Shipston Road Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 7LR / GB | For all designated states BOTHWELL, Roy "Meoncote", 114 Shipston Road Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 7LR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states BOTHWELL, Peter William "Meoncote" 114 Shipston Road Stratford-upon-Avon, Warwickshire CV37 7LR / GB | ||
For all designated states BOTHWELL, Roy "Meoncote", 114 Shipston Road Stratford-upon-Avon, Warwickshire CV37 7LR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Dodd, Graham Marshall, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Dodd, Graham Marshall, et al Forrester & Boehmert Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92906832.8 | 24.03.1992 | [1994/05] | WO1992GB00536 | Priority number, date | GB19910006712 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9106712 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217349 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580610 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580610 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/00, B62D21/15 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B60N2/01 (EP);
B62D21/15 (EP);
B62D39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKARROSSERIE | [1994/05] | English: | VEHICLE AND BODY | [1994/05] | French: | VEHICULE ET CARROSSERIE | [1994/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1993 | 02.11.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1993 | 02.11.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1993 | 02.11.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.11.1993 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.1995 | 31.03.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3860258 ; | [A]US3171669 ; | [A]DE3925990 ; | [A]GB2169377 ; | [A]WO8908678 ; | [A]US4640527 ; | [A]EP0159555 |