EP0571544 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FREE OF OVER-RUNNING CLUTCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPILOGICS, INC. 160 C Albright Way Los Gatos California 95030 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states EPILOGICS, INC. 160 C Albright Way Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | ||
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states PIRES, Paul B. 1350 Dundee Avenue Ben Lomond, CA 95005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRES, Paul B. 1350 Dundee Avenue Ben Lomond, CA 95005 / US | [1994/05] |
Former [1993/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92907124.9 | 20.02.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992US01343 | Priority number, date | US19910660292 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: US 660292 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214950 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571544 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16H29/04, F16H31/00 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
F16H29/02 (EP,US);
F16H37/084 (EP,US);
Y10T74/151 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1667 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE OHNE FREILÄUFE | [1993/48] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE TRANSMISSION FREE OF OVER-RUNNING CLUTCHES | [1993/48] | French: | TRANSMISSION A VARIATION CONTINUE DEPOURVUE D'UN EMBRAYAGE A ROUE LIBRE | [1993/48] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1993 | Search fee paid | 13.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/37] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "HEAVY DUTY CVT WORKS WITHOUT A BELT", MACHINE DESIGN, CLEVELAND, OHIO, US, (19891109), vol. 61, no. 22, pages 55 - 56, XP000072933 [A] 1,9,10,21 | International search | [X]US787080 (CONANT WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US4090413 (VICKLAND JACK M); | [A]US4338830 (RODAWAY KEITH S); | [A]US4515026 (PERKINS FRANK M [US]); | [A]US4813298 (KURTOSSY CSABA G [US]); | [A]US4983151 (PIRES PAUL B [US]) |