EP0577663 - DISTRIBUTION UNIT FOR A VENTILATION INSTALLATION FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AUTOMOBILE AKTIEBOLAG 461 80 Trollhättan / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states SAAB AUTOMOBILE AKTIEBOLAG S-461 80 Trollhättan / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Roland Mörlanda PL 2074 S-466 00 Sollebrunn / SE | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Holmborn, Erland Karl Scania CV AB Patents, TY 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Holmborn, Erland Karl Scania CV AB Patents, TY S-151 87 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 92907157.9 | 24.03.1992 | [1994/02] | WO1992SE00185 | Priority number, date | SE19910000930 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: SE 9100930 | [1994/02] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217345 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577663 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577663 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/00692 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/02] | Title | German: | LUFTVERTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGBELÜFTUNGSANLAGE | [1994/02] | English: | DISTRIBUTION UNIT FOR A VENTILATION INSTALLATION FOR A VEHICLE | [1994/02] | French: | UNITE DE DISTRIBUTION POUR L'INSTALLATION DE VENTILATION D'UN VEHICULE | [1994/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1992 | Translation filed | 21.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 21.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1359909 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS PANHARD) |