EP0677002 - VEHICLE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McLAREN CARS N.V. 7 Abraham de Veerstraat, P.O. Box 840 Curaçao / AN | [1995/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, Gordon Willow Cottage, Cut Mill PuttenhamGGuildford, Surrey GU3 1BG / GB | [1995/42] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Needle, Jacqueline W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92907220.5 | 25.03.1992 | [1995/42] | WO1992GB00544 | Priority number, date | GB19910074351 | 09.04.1991 Original published format: GB 91074351 | [1995/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9218347 | Date: | 29.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0677002 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0677002 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/00 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B60N2/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1995/42] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKARROSSERIE | [1995/42] | English: | VEHICLE BODY | [1995/42] | French: | CARROSSERIE DE VEHICULE | [1995/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.10.1993 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1998/35] | FR | 13.02.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191306685 (FAIRBROTHER HENRY [GB]); | [X]GB1126166 (PININFARINA SPA CARROZZERIA); | [X]DE304677 ; | [X]FR1144964 ; | [A]FR2094745 (PASTY DIANE); | [AP]EP0423669 (BULGARI GIANNI SPA [IT]) | Examination | GB191306685 | by applicant | DE304677 |