EP0636050 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LASER ISOTOPE SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNERGETIC RESOURCES LIMITED 4th Floor, Queen Victoria House, Victoria Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states SYNERGETIC RESOURCES LIMITED 4th Floor, Queen Victoria House, Victoria Street Douglas, Isle of Man / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREOU, Doros Synergetic Resources Limited 4th Floor, Queen Victoria House Victoria Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Mounteney, Simon James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1995/05] | Lawson, David Glynne MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92907223.9 | 26.03.1992 | [1995/05] | WO1992GB00552 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318844 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636050 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D59/34 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B01D59/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1995/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ISOTOPENTRENNUNG MITTELS LASER | [1995/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LASER ISOTOPE SEPARATION | [1995/05] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL DE SEPARATION D'ISOTOPES PAR LASER | [1995/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/25] | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4107536 (ST PETERS RICHARD L); | [X]EP0357148 (ULTRA CENTRIFUGE NEDERLAND NV [NL]); | [X]DE2627995 (JERSEY NUCLEAR AVCO ISOTOPES); | [X]US4302305 (KALDOR ANDREW, et al); | [Y]DE2810791 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG); | [Y]US4946567 (MICHON MAURICE [FR], et al); | [Y]US4944573 (MICHON MAURICE [FR]) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 97, no. 24, 13 December 1982, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Alimpiev, S.S. et al : "Spectral dependences of excitation of high vibrational levels in a uranium hexafluoride molecule ", see page 493, abstract 205270n, & Kvantovaya Elektron. 1981, 8( 3), 623- 3 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 105, no. 8, 25 August 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Oyama, Toshiyuki et al : "Uranium hexafluoride photodissociation through measurement of visible and infrared luminescence ", see page 619, abstract 69921e, & J. Nucl. Sci. Technol. 1986, 23( 6), 522- |