EP0578706 - FILM PRINTING PROCESS AND FILM TRANSFER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAPPE, Kurt Erlenstrasse 23 D-41470 Neuss / DE | For all designated states OUDT, Fred Zeedijk 98, Royal Palace - App. 210 8400 Oostende / BE | [1994/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92907895.4 | 31.03.1992 | [1994/03] | WO1992DE00275 | Priority number, date | DE19914110801 | 04.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4110801 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9217338 | Date: | 15.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578706 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578706 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/06 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
B41F16/002 (EP);
B41F17/00 (US);
B41F16/0033 (EP);
B41F19/062 (EP,US);
B41M1/22 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1705 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | FOLIENDRUCKVERFAHREN SOWIE FOLIENTRANSFERMASCHINE | [1994/03] | English: | FILM PRINTING PROCESS AND FILM TRANSFER MACHINE | [1994/03] | French: | PROCEDE ET MACHINE D'IMPRESSION PAR DECALQUAGE | [1994/03] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1995
11.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.1995
11.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. Schwabacher Strasse 482 D-90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Kesslerplatz 1 D-90489 Nürnberg / DE | 11.09.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.01.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.03.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.06.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/41] | Appeal following opposition | 30.04.1997 | Appeal received No. T0473/97 | 01.07.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.06.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 28.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2000 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3713666 (STEUER ARMIN [DE]) |