EP0537308 - Ground proximity excessive descent rate warning instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/16] | IMPROVED GROUND PROXIMITY WARNING INSTRUMENT UTILIZING GLIDESLOPE MODULATION OF EXCESSIVE DESCENT RATE ENVELOPE | ||
[1995/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states AlliedSignal, Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION, INC. 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATEMAN, Charles, D. 16803 N.E. 16th Place Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Marshall, John Grahame, et al SERJEANTS 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Marshall, John Grahame, et al SERJEANTS 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | ||
Former [1993/16] | Marshall, John Grahame SERJEANTS 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92908435.8 | 12.02.1992 | [1993/16] | WO1992US01133 | Priority number, date | US19910666094 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: US 666094 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215976 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537308 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537308 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01C5/00, G08B23/00 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
G05D1/0607 (EP,US);
G01C5/06 (EP,US);
G01P1/10 (EP,US);
G01S1/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/16] | G08B23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/16] | Title | German: | Instrument zur Warnung vor zu grosser Sinkgeschwindigkeit in Bodennähe | [1995/16] | English: | Ground proximity excessive descent rate warning instrument | [1995/16] | French: | Dispositif d'avertissement d'une vitesse de descente excessive à proximité de sol | [1995/16] |
Former [1993/16] | INSTRUMENT IN BODENNAEHE ZUR WARNING BEI UEBERMAESSIGER ABSTEIGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LANDEWINKELMODULATION | ||
Former [1993/16] | IMPROVED GROUND PROXIMITY WARNING INSTRUMENT UTILIZING GLIDESLOPE MODULATION OF EXCESSIVE DESCENT RATE ENVELOPE | ||
Former [1993/16] | DISPOSITIF AMELIORE D'AVERTISSEMENT D'APPROCHE DU SOL UTILISANT LA MODULATION DE L'ANGLE D'ATTERRISSAGE DANS UNE VITESSE DE DESCENTE EXCESSIVE | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.01.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 | 06.01.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.01.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3946358 (BATEMAN CHARLES DONALD); | [A]WO8701356 (SUNDSTRAND DATA CONTROL [US]); | [Y]US4684948 (BATEMAN CHARLES D [US]); | [A]US4947164 (BATEMAN CHARLES D [US]) |