EP0565644 - FEEDER MECHANISM FOR SLEEVE TYPE CARTONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | ||
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION 2000 Courthouse Plaza NE Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALVERT, Rodney, K. 5422 Mt. Vernon Way Dunwoody, GA 30338 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1994/01] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | ||
Former [1993/42] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court, Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 92908509.0 | 04.03.1992 | [1993/42] | WO1992US01696 | Priority number, date | US19910664639 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: US 664639 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215450 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565644 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B31B5/80, B31B1/80 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
B65B43/305 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2120/30 (EP,US);
B31B50/804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/42] | Title | German: | ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR HÜLSENFÖRMIGE SCHACHTELN | [1993/42] | English: | FEEDER MECHANISM FOR SLEEVE TYPE CARTONS | [1993/42] | French: | MECANISME ALIMENTATEUR POUR CARTONS EN FORME DE BOITES | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1993 | Search fee paid | 05.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/52] | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.07.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.07.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 | 09.07.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.07.1993 | M01   Fee paid on   05.08.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2053133 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [Y]US4625575 (LE BRAS PHILIPPE A [FR]) | International search | [X]US2887022 (LUBERSKY ALBERT R, et al); | [A]US3599541 (ALLEN ROBERT J); | [X]US4194442 (MARTELLI GUGLIELMO [IT]); | [A]US4389205 (RIGHI BRUNO [IT]); | [Y]US4596545 (GREENWELL JOSEPH D [US]) |