EP0576561 - IMPROVED ROTARY HEAD MULTI-SPRING HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARSEVER, Sol 25 Treeworthy Street Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [1994/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLEV, Moshe 22 Yehiam Street 47 100 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 92908686.6 | 04.03.1992 | [1994/01] | WO1992US01833 | Priority number, date | US19910664757 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: US 664757 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215221 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576561 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
A45D26/0052 (EP,US);
A45D26/0023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | ENTHAARUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN SCHRAUBENFEDERN UND EINEM DREHBAREN KOPF | [1994/01] | English: | IMPROVED ROTARY HEAD MULTI-SPRING HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE | [1994/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DEPILATOIRE AMELIORE COMPORTANT DES RESSORTS MULTIPLES ET UNE TETE ROTATIVE | [1994/01] | File destroyed: | 07.09.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 30.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 02.08.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.1994 | 31.03.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4079741 (DAAR YAIR, et al); | [AP]US5032126 (CLEYET AIME [FR], et al); | [AP]US5007116 (YAMAMOTO MASAO [JP]); | [AE]US5100413 (DOLEV MOSHE [IL]); | [AE]US5112341 (DOLEY MOSHE [IL]); | [AE]US5100414 (DOLEV MOSHE [IL]); | [A]WO9100700 (BRAUN AG [DE]) |