EP0552321 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING INDICIA ON DIAMONDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRY WINSTON S.A. 24, quai Général-Guisan CH-1204 Geneva / CH | [1994/21] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states HARRY WINSTON S.A. 24, quai Général-Guisan CH-1204 Geneva / CH | ||
For all designated states WINSTON, Ronald H. 256 Griffen Avenue Scardale, NY 10583 / US | |||
For all designated states ALEV, Necip 18 Wood End Lane Bronxville, NY 10708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINSTON, Ronald, H. 256 Griffen Avenue Scarsdale, NY 10583 / US | 02 /
ALEV, Necip 18 Wood End Lane Bronxville, NY 10708 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92908743.5 | 09.10.1991 | [1993/30] | WO1991US07561 | Priority number, date | US19900595861 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: US 595861 | US19910770446 | 08.10.1991 Original published format: US 770446 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9209876 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552321 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552321 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23K26/06, B44B7/00, B28D5/00 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
B44B7/00 (EP,US);
B23K26/066 (EP,KR,US);
B28D5/00 (EP,US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
B23K2103/30 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHRIFTEN VON DIAMANTEN | [1993/30] | English: | METHODS FOR PRODUCING INDICIA ON DIAMONDS | [1993/30] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MARQUES SUR DES DIAMANTS | [1993/30] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/13: (deleted) | EPB 1997/13: (deleted) | EPB 1997/13: (deleted) | EPB 1996/44: Teilanmeldung 96113311.3 eingereicht am 20/08/96 | EPB 1996/44: Divisional application 96113311.3 filed on 20/08/96 | EPB 1996/44: Demande divisionnaire 96113311.3 déposée le 20/08/96 | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 05.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96113311.3 / EP0749799 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.03.1997 | [2008/24] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3527198 (TAKAOKA TAKASHI); | [Y]US4392476 (GRESSER HERBERT D, et al); | [Y]US4467172 (EHRENWALD JERRY [US], et al); | [A]US4842782 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US], et al); | [Y]US4912298 (DANIELS ERWIN [DE], et al) |