EP0584121 - WHEELCHAIR, IN PARTICULAR FOR PARAPLEGICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOLL, Rainer Eschenstrasse 6 D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE | [1994/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Reinhardt, Harry, et al Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92909458.9 | 06.05.1992 | [1994/09] | WO1992DE00355 | Priority number, date | DE19910005574U | 06.05.1991 Original published format: DE 9105574 U | DE19914141158 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4141158 | [1994/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9219202 | Date: | 12.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584121 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584121 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/14 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
A61G2200/36 (EP,US);
Y10S297/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/09] | Title | German: | ROLLSTUHL, INSBESONDERE FÜR QUERSCHNITTGELÄHMTE MENSCHEN | [1994/09] | English: | WHEELCHAIR, IN PARTICULAR FOR PARAPLEGICS | [1994/09] | French: | FAUTEUIL ROULANT, NOTAMMENT POUR PARAPLEGIQUES | [1994/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.09.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/30] | FR | 09.02.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2259383 (LAST WERNER); | [A]EP0059141 (POIRIER SA [FR]); | [A]US4530122 (SANDERS ROBERT C [US], et al); | [A]GB2178375 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE); | [A]US4948156 (FORTNER GLENN D [US]) |