EP0547227 - OPTICAL SURFACE INSPECTION DEVICE FOR MILL ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohamacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO 3-18, Wakinohamacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Makoto, Kakogawaseitetsusho Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 1, Kanazawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-01 / JP | 02 /
AZUMA, Makoto, Kakogawaseitetsusho Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 1, Kanazawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-01 / JP | 03 /
DEJIMA, Katsuro, Kakogawaseitetsusho Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 1, Kanazawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-01 / JP | 04 /
MAEDA, Yukiyoshi, Kakogawaseitetsusho Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 1, Kanazawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-01 / JP | 05 /
YOSHITAKE, Kunihiko, Kakogawaseitetsusho Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 1, Kanazawa-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-01 / JP | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92909719.4 | 14.05.1992 | [1993/25] | WO1992JP00617 | Priority number, date | JP19910165648 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16564891 | [1993/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9301488 | Date: | 21.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547227 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, B21B37/00, B21B27/10 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B21B27/10 (EP,US);
B21B38/00 (EP,US);
G01B11/30 (EP,US);
G01B11/303 (EP,US);
G01N21/88 (EP,US);
G01N21/8901 (EP,US);
B21B28/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/25] | G01N21/88, B05B1/00, B21B27/10, B21B28/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENINSPEKTION EINER WALZE | [1993/25] | English: | OPTICAL SURFACE INSPECTION DEVICE FOR MILL ROLL | [1993/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE D'INSPECTION DE SURFACE POUR ROULEAU DE LAMINOIR | [1993/25] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1993 | Translation filed | 24.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1993 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/43] | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60122302 ; | [DA]JPH01295108 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851108), vol. 9, no. 281, Database accession no. (P - 403), & JP60122302 A 19850629 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900214), vol. 14, no. 78, Database accession no. (P - 1006), & JP01295108 A 19891128 (KAWASAKI STEEL) [DA] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS59174204 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [Y]JPS6329237 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JPS6415951U ; | [A]JPS5512322B |